Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4372 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 4372


 AN ACT
 relating to youth camp abuse complaints and compliance orders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 141, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Sections 141.0051 and 141.0085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 141.0051.  LICENSE; CONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN
 CONVICTIONS. In making a determination on issuance, renewal, or
 revocation of a youth camp operator's license, the department shall
 consider whether the youth camp employs an individual who was
 convicted of an act of sexual abuse, as defined by Section 21.02,
 Penal Code, that occurred at the camp.
 Sec. 141.0085.  REPORTS OF ABUSE; DUTIES OF YOUTH CAMP
 OPERATOR. (a)  The executive commissioner by rule shall establish a
 procedure for the department to forward a report of alleged abuse of
 a camper that is received by the department to the Department of
 Family and Protective Services or another appropriate agency.
 (b)  If a law enforcement agency notifies a youth camp
 operator of the investigation or conviction of an individual who is
 employed by the camp for an act of sexual abuse, as defined by
 Section 21.02, Penal Code, that occurred at the camp, the operator
 shall:
 (1)  immediately notify the department of the
 investigation or conviction; and
 (2)  retain all records related to the investigation or
 conviction until the department notifies the camp that the record
 retention is no longer required.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 141, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Sections 141.0111 and 141.0112 to read as follows:
 Sec. 141.0111.  REQUIRED INFORMATION ABOUT ABUSE REPORTING.
 A youth camp operator shall develop and maintain a written policy
 regarding the method for reporting to the department suspected
 abuse occurring at the camp. The operator on request of any person
 shall provide a copy of the policy to the person.
 Sec. 141.0112.  REQUIRED NOTICE ABOUT YOUTH CAMP COMPLAINTS
 AND DISCIPLINARY ACTIONS. (a)  The department shall post on the
 department's Internet website each youth camp compliance order
 issued by the department until at least the third anniversary of the
 date the compliance order was finally adjudicated.
 (b)  A youth camp operator shall include on the camp's
 publicly accessible Internet website a clearly marked link to the
 youth camp program web page on the department's Internet website.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Sections 141.0085, 141.0111,
 and 141.0112, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a youth
 camp operator is not required to comply with those sections until
 January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4372 was passed by the House on May
 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 7, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4372 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 1,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4372 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor