Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4390 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 4390


 AN ACT
 relating to the privacy of personal identifying information and the
 creation of the Texas Privacy Protection Advisory Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.053, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (i) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A person who conducts business in this state and owns or
 licenses computerized data that includes sensitive personal
 information shall disclose any breach of system security, after
 discovering or receiving notification of the breach, to any
 individual whose sensitive personal information was, or is
 reasonably believed to have been, acquired by an unauthorized
 person. The disclosure shall be made without unreasonable delay and
 in each case not later than the 60th day after the date on which the
 person determines that the breach occurred [as quickly as
 possible], except as provided by Subsection (d) or as necessary to
 determine the scope of the breach and restore the reasonable
 integrity of the data system.
 (i)  A person who is required to disclose or provide
 notification of a breach of system security under this section
 shall notify the attorney general of that breach not later than the
 60th day after the date on which the person determines that the
 breach occurred if the breach involves at least 250 residents of
 this state. The notification under this subsection must include:
 (1)  a detailed description of the nature and
 circumstances of the breach or the use of sensitive personal
 information acquired as a result of the breach;
 (2)  the number of residents of this state affected by
 the breach at the time of notification;
 (3)  the measures taken by the person regarding the
 breach;
 (4)  any measures the person intends to take regarding
 the breach after the notification under this subsection; and
 (5)  information regarding whether law enforcement is
 engaged in investigating the breach.
 SECTION 2.  (a) In this section, "council" means the Texas
 Privacy Protection Advisory Council created under this section.
 (b)  The Texas Privacy Protection Advisory Council is
 created to study data privacy laws in this state, other states, and
 relevant foreign jurisdictions.
 (c)  The council is composed of members who are residents of
 this state and appointed as follows:
 (1)  five members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives, two of whom must be representatives of an
 industry listed under Subsection (d) of this section and three of
 whom must be members of the house of representatives;
 (2)  five members appointed by the lieutenant governor,
 two of whom must be representatives of an industry listed under
 Subsection (d) of this section and three of whom must be senators;
 and
 (3)  five members appointed by the governor, three of
 whom must be representatives of an industry listed under Subsection
 (d) of this section and two of whom must be either:
 (A)  a representative of a nonprofit organization
 that studies or evaluates data privacy laws from the perspective of
 individuals whose information is collected or processed by
 businesses; or
 (B)  a professor who teaches at a law school in
 this state or other institution of higher education, as defined by
 Section 61.003, Education Code, and whose books or scholarly
 articles on the topic of data privacy have been published.
 (d)  For purposes of making appointments of members who
 represent industries under Subsection (c) of this section, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, lieutenant governor, and
 governor shall appoint members from among the following industries
 and must coordinate their appointments to avoid overlap in
 representation of the industries:
 (1)  medical profession;
 (2)  technology;
 (3)  Internet;
 (4)  retail and electronic transactions;
 (5)  consumer banking;
 (6)  telecommunications;
 (7)  consumer data analytics;
 (8)  advertising;
 (9)  Internet service providers;
 (10)  social media platforms;
 (11)  cloud data storage;
 (12)  virtual private networks; or
 (13)  retail electric.
 (e)  The speaker of the house of representatives and the
 lieutenant governor shall each designate a co-chair from among
 their respective appointments to the council who are members of the
 legislature.
 (f)  The council shall convene on a regular basis at the
 joint call of the co-chairs.
 (g)  The council shall:
 (1)  study and evaluate the laws in this state, other
 states, and relevant foreign jurisdictions that govern the privacy
 and protection of information that alone or in conjunction with
 other information identifies or is linked or reasonably linkable to
 a specific individual, technological device, or household; and
 (2)  make recommendations to the members of the
 legislature on specific statutory changes regarding the privacy and
 protection of that information, including changes to Chapter 521,
 Business & Commerce Code, as amended by this Act, or to the Penal
 Code, that appear necessary from the results of the council's study
 under this section.
 (h)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the council shall
 report the council's findings and recommendations to the members of
 the legislature.
 (i)  The Department of Information Resources shall provide
 administrative support to the council.
 (j)  Not later than the 60th day after the effective date of
 this Act, the speaker of the house of representatives, the
 lieutenant governor, and the governor shall appoint the members of
 the council.
 (k)  The council is abolished and this section expires
 December 31, 2020.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 (b)  Section 521.053, Business & Commerce Code, as amended by
 this Act, takes effect January 1, 2020.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4390 was passed by the House on May 7,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4390 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 3,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4390 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor