Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019