Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB440 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 440
1+By: Murphy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 440
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019;
3+ April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Property Tax; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to general obligation bonds issued by political
612 subdivisions.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 45, Education Code, is
915 amended by adding Section 45.1105 to read as follows:
1016 Sec. 45.1105. USE OF UNSPENT GENERAL OBLIGATION BOND
1117 PROCEEDS. (a) A school district may use the unspent proceeds of
1218 issued general obligation bonds only:
1319 (1) for the specific purposes for which the bonds were
1420 authorized;
1521 (2) to retire the bonds; or
1622 (3) for a purpose other than the specific purposes for
1723 which the bonds were authorized if:
1824 (A) the specific purposes are accomplished or
1925 abandoned; and
2026 (B) the board of trustees at a public meeting
2127 held only for the purpose of considering the use of the unspent bond
2228 proceeds approves in separate votes the use of the proceeds for:
2329 (i) a purpose other than to retire the
2430 bonds; and
2531 (ii) the purpose specified at the time the
2632 vote is taken.
2733 (b) In addition to other requirements of law, notice of a
2834 public meeting held under this section must include a statement
2935 that the board of trustees will consider the use of unspent bond
3036 proceeds for a purpose other than the specific purposes for which
3137 the bonds were authorized.
3238 (c) A public meeting held under this section must provide
3339 the public an opportunity to address the board of trustees on the
3440 question of using the unspent bond proceeds for a purpose other than
3541 the specific purposes for which the bonds were authorized.
3642 SECTION 2. Section 4.003(f), Election Code, is amended to
3743 read as follows:
3844 (f) A debt obligation election order required under Section
3945 3.009 shall be posted:
4046 (1) on election day and during early voting by
4147 personal appearance, in a prominent location at each polling place;
4248 (2) not later than the 21st day before the election, in
4349 three public places in the boundaries of the political subdivision
4450 holding the election; and
4551 (3) during the 21 days before the election, on the
4652 political subdivision's Internet website, prominently and together
4753 with the notice of the election, [and] the contents of the
4854 proposition, and any sample ballot prepared for the election, if
4955 the political subdivision maintains an Internet website.
5056 SECTION 3. Subtitle C, Title 9, Government Code, is amended
5157 by adding Chapter 1253 to read as follows:
5258 CHAPTER 1253. GENERAL OBLIGATION BONDS ISSUED BY POLITICAL
5359 SUBDIVISIONS
5460 Sec. 1253.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "political
5561 subdivision" means a county, municipality, school district, junior
5662 college district, other special district, or other subdivision of
5763 state government.
5864 Sec. 1253.002. LIMITATION ON AUTHORITY TO ISSUE GENERAL
59- OBLIGATION BONDS. (a) In this section, "personal property" has the
60- meaning assigned by Section 1.04, Tax Code.
65+ OBLIGATION BONDS. (a) In this section, "personal property" has
66+ the meaning assigned by Section 1.04, Tax Code.
6167 (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a political
6268 subdivision may not issue general obligation bonds to purchase,
63- improve, or construct one or more improvements to real property, to
64- purchase one or more items of personal property, or to do both, if
65- the weighted average maturity of the issue of bonds exceeds 120
66- percent of the reasonably expected weighted average economic life
67- of the improvements and personal property financed with the issue
68- of bonds.
69+ improve, or construct an improvement to real property or to
70+ purchase personal property if the weighted average maturity of the
71+ issue of bonds to finance the improvement or personal property
72+ exceeds 120 percent of the reasonably expected weighted average
73+ economic life of the improvement or personal property financed with
74+ the issue of bonds.
6975 Sec. 1253.003. USE OF UNSPENT GENERAL OBLIGATION BOND
70- PROCEEDS. (a) A political subdivision other than a school district
71- may use the unspent proceeds of issued general obligation bonds
72- only:
76+ PROCEEDS. (a) A political subdivision other than a school
77+ district may use the unspent proceeds of issued general obligation
78+ bonds only:
7379 (1) for the specific purposes for which the bonds were
7480 authorized;
7581 (2) to retire the bonds; or
7682 (3) for a purpose other than the specific purposes for
7783 which the bonds were authorized if:
7884 (A) the specific purposes are accomplished or
7985 abandoned; and
8086 (B) a majority of the votes cast in an election
8187 held in the political subdivision approve the use of the proceeds
8288 for the proposed purpose.
8389 (b) The election order and the notice of election for an
8490 election described by Subsection (a)(3)(B) must state the proposed
8591 purpose for which the bond proceeds are to be used.
8692 (c) A political subdivision must hold an election described
8793 by Subsection (a)(3)(B) in the same manner as an election to issue
8894 bonds in the political subdivision.
8995 SECTION 4. Chapter 1332, Government Code, is repealed.
9096 SECTION 5. Section 1253.002, Government Code, as added by
9197 this Act, applies only to a general obligation bond authorized to be
9298 issued at an election held on or after the effective date of this
9399 Act.
94100 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
95- ______________________________ ______________________________
96- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
97- I certify that H.B. No. 440 was passed by the House on
98- April
99- 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 1 present,
100- not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to
101- H.B. No. 440 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays
102- 0, 1 present, not voting.
103- ______________________________
104- Chief Clerk of the House
105- I certify that H.B. No. 440 was passed by the Senate, with
106- amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
107- 0.
108- ______________________________
109- Secretary of the Senate
110- APPROVED: __________________
111- Date
112- __________________
113- Governor
101+ * * * * *