House | 05/08/2019 | Postponed 3/2/20 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Record vote RV#1163 | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Postponed 5/8/19 9:30 PM | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 18(a)(3) | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed |