Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill April 16, 2019