Senate | 05/13/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Record vote RV#1258 | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Human Services | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed |