Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019