Senate | 05/15/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Record vote RV#1361 | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Filed |