Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4705 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 26, 2019