Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019