1 | | - | H.B. No. 475 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Howard, Wu (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 475 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 475 By: Perry |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to information for foster children who are pregnant or |
---|
6 | 14 | | minor parents. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 264.130 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 264.130. PREGNANCY AND PARENTING INFORMATION. The |
---|
11 | 19 | | department at developmentally appropriate stages shall ensure that |
---|
12 | 20 | | children in the managing conservatorship of the department who are |
---|
13 | 21 | | pregnant or who are minor parents receive information on and |
---|
14 | 22 | | support in providing safe environments for children, including |
---|
15 | 23 | | information and support regarding: |
---|
16 | 24 | | (1) safe sleeping arrangements; |
---|
17 | 25 | | (2) suggestions for childproofing potentially |
---|
18 | 26 | | dangerous settings in a home; |
---|
19 | 27 | | (3) child development and methods to cope with |
---|
20 | 28 | | challenging behaviors; |
---|
21 | 29 | | (4) selection of appropriate substitute caregivers; |
---|
22 | 30 | | (5) a child's early brain development, including the |
---|
23 | 31 | | importance of meeting an infant's developmental needs by providing |
---|
24 | 32 | | positive experiences and avoiding adverse experiences; |
---|
25 | 33 | | (6) the importance of paternal involvement in a |
---|
26 | 34 | | child's life and methods for coparenting; |
---|
27 | 35 | | (7) the benefits of reading, singing, and talking to |
---|
28 | 36 | | young children; |
---|
29 | 37 | | (8) the importance of prenatal and postpartum care for |
---|
30 | 38 | | both the mother and infant, including the impact of and signs for |
---|
31 | 39 | | perinatal mood disorders; |
---|
32 | 40 | | (9) infant nutrition and the importance of |
---|
33 | 41 | | breastfeeding; and |
---|
34 | 42 | | (10) healthy relationships, including the prevention |
---|
35 | 43 | | of intimate partner violence. |
---|
36 | 44 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
39 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 475 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
40 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 6, 2 present, not |
---|
41 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
42 | | - | No. 475 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 |
---|
43 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 475 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
47 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
48 | | - | 0. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
51 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Date |
---|
53 | | - | __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 45 | + | * * * * * |
---|