Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 28, 2019