Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB496 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            H.B. No. 496


 AN ACT
 relating to traumatic injury response protocol and the use of
 bleeding control stations in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.030 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.030.  TRAUMATIC INJURY RESPONSE PROTOCOL. (a) Each
 school district and open-enrollment charter school shall develop
 and annually make available a protocol for school employees and
 volunteers to follow in the event of a traumatic injury.
 (b)  The protocol required under this section must:
 (1)  provide for a school district or open-enrollment
 charter school to maintain and make available to school employees
 and volunteers bleeding control stations, as described by
 Subsection (d), for use in the event of a traumatic injury involving
 blood loss;
 (2)  ensure that bleeding control stations are stored
 in easily accessible areas of the campus that are selected by the
 district's school safety and security committee or the charter
 school's governing body;
 (3)  require that agency-approved training on the use
 of a bleeding control station in the event of an injury to another
 person be provided to:
 (A)  each school district peace officer
 commissioned under Section 37.081 or school security personnel
 employed under that section who provides security services at the
 campus;
 (B)  each school resource officer who provides law
 enforcement at the campus; and
 (C)  all other district or school personnel who
 may be reasonably expected to use a bleeding control station; and
 (4)  require the district or charter school to annually
 offer instruction on the use of a bleeding control station from a
 school resource officer or other appropriate district or school
 personnel who has received the training under Subdivision (3) to
 students enrolled at the campus in grade seven or higher.
 (c)  A district's school safety and security committee or the
 charter school's governing body may select, as easily accessible
 areas of the campus at which bleeding control stations may be
 stored, areas of the campus where automated external defibrillators
 are stored.
 (d)  A bleeding control station required under this section
 must contain all of the following required supplies in quantities
 determined appropriate by the superintendent of the district or the
 director of the school:
 (1)  tourniquets approved for use in battlefield trauma
 care by the armed forces of the United States;
 (2)  chest seals;
 (3)  compression bandages;
 (4)  bleeding control bandages;
 (5)  space emergency blankets;
 (6)  latex-free gloves;
 (7)  markers;
 (8)  scissors; and
 (9)  instructional documents developed by the American
 College of Surgeons or the United States Department of Homeland
 Security detailing methods to prevent blood loss following a
 traumatic event.
 (e)  In addition to the items listed under Subsection (d), a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school may also include
 in a bleeding control station any medical material or equipment
 that:
 (1)  may be readily stored in a bleeding control
 station;
 (2)  may be used to adequately treat an injury
 involving traumatic blood loss; and
 (3)  is approved by local law enforcement or emergency
 medical services personnel.
 (f)  To satisfy the training requirement of Subsection
 (b)(3), the agency may approve a course of instruction that has been
 developed or endorsed by:
 (1)  the American College of Surgeons or a similar
 organization; or
 (2)  the emergency medicine department of a
 health-related institution of higher education or a hospital.
 (g)  The course of instruction for training described under
 Subsection (f) may not be provided as an online course. The course
 of instruction must use nationally recognized, evidence-based
 guidelines for bleeding control and must incorporate instruction on
 the psychomotor skills necessary to use a bleeding control station
 in the event of an injury to another person, including instruction
 on proper chest seal placement.
 (h)  The course of instruction described under Subsection
 (f) may be provided by emergency medical technicians, paramedics,
 law enforcement officers, firefighters, representatives of the
 organization or institution that developed or endorsed the
 training, educators, other public school employees, or other
 similarly qualified individuals. A course of instruction described
 under Subsection (f) is not required to provide for certification
 in bleeding control. If the course of instruction does provide for
 certification in bleeding control, the instructor must be
 authorized to provide the instruction for the purpose of
 certification by the organization or institution that developed or
 endorsed the course of instruction.
 (i)  The good faith use of a bleeding control station by a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school employee to
 control the bleeding of an injured person is incident to or within
 the scope of the duties of the employee's position of employment and
 involves the exercise of judgment or discretion on the part of the
 employee for purposes of Section 22.0511, and a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school and the employees of the district or
 school are immune from civil liability, as provided by that
 section, from damages or injuries resulting from that good faith
 use of a bleeding control station. A school district or
 open-enrollment charter school volunteer is immune from civil
 liability from damages or injuries resulting from the good faith
 use of a bleeding control station to the same extent as a
 professional employee of the district or school, as provided by
 Section 22.053.
 (j)  Nothing in this section limits the immunity from
 liability of a school district, open-enrollment charter school, or
 district or school employee or volunteer under:
 (1)  Sections 22.0511 and 22.053;
 (2)  Section 101.051, Civil Practice and Remedies Code;
 or
 (3)  any other applicable law.
 (k)  This section does not create a cause of action against a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school or the employees
 or volunteers of the district or school.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than October 1, 2019, the Texas
 Education Agency shall approve a course of instruction on the use of
 a bleeding control station that is appropriate to satisfy the
 requirement under Section 38.030, Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 (b)  As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act, and not later than January 1, 2020, each school district and
 open-enrollment charter school shall develop and implement the
 traumatic injury response protocol required by Section 38.030,
 Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 496 was passed by the House on May 10,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 91, Nays 34, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 496 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 496 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 124,
 Nays 21, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 496 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 23, Nays
 8; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 496 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays 6.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor