Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019