Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 5
1+By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 5
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
4+ Rural Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to debris management and other disaster recovery efforts.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
814 amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, 418.056, and 418.057
915 to read as follows:
1016 Sec. 418.054. CATASTROPHIC DEBRIS MANAGEMENT PLAN AND
1117 TRAINING. (a) The division, in consultation with any other state
1218 agencies selected by the division, shall develop a catastrophic
1319 debris management plan and model guide for use by political
1420 subdivisions in the event of a disaster.
1521 (b) The plan must:
1622 (1) provide a guide for clearance and disposal of
1723 debris caused by a disaster, including information on preparing for
1824 debris removal before a disaster; and
1925 (2) include:
2026 (A) provisions for the use of trench burners and
2127 air curtain incinerators of vegetative debris, including
2228 identifying sources of equipment for use immediately following a
2329 disaster; and
2430 (B) procedures for:
2531 (i) vegetative debris burning, including
2632 the role of the Texas Department of Transportation in debris
2733 removal;
2834 (ii) the coordination of clearance and
2935 disposal of debris;
3036 (iii) obtaining equipment necessary for use
3137 immediately following a disaster; and
3238 (iv) the interaction between political
3339 subdivisions and state and federal agencies.
3440 (c) The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service shall
3541 establish a training program for state agencies and political
3642 subdivisions on the use of trench burners in debris removal.
3743 Sec. 418.055. CONTRACTING FOR DEBRIS REMOVAL. (a) The
3844 division, in consultation with the Federal Emergency Management
3945 Agency, shall develop and publish a model contract for debris
4046 removal services to be used by political subdivisions following a
4147 disaster.
4248 (b) The division shall consult with the comptroller to:
4349 (1) establish appropriate contracting standards and
4450 contractor requirements to include in the model contract; and
4551 (2) include a contract for debris removal services on
4652 the schedule of multiple award contracts developed under Subchapter
4753 I, Chapter 2155, or in another cooperative purchasing program
4854 administered by the comptroller.
4955 Sec. 418.056. WET DEBRIS STUDY GROUP. (a) In this section,
5056 "study group" means the wet debris study group established under
5157 this section.
5258 (b) The wet debris study group is established and composed
5359 of representatives of the division, any other state agencies
5460 selected by the division, and local and federal governmental
5561 entities.
5662 (c) The chief of the division serves as chair of the study
5763 group.
5864 (d) The study group shall study issues related to removal of
5965 wet debris, including best practices for clearing wet debris
6066 following a disaster and determining responsibility for that
6167 removal.
6268 (e) Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall
6369 submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described
6470 by Subsection (d) to each member of the legislature.
6571 (f) The study group is abolished and this section expires
6672 January 1, 2021.
6773 Sec. 418.057. WORK GROUP ON LOCAL RESTRICTIONS THAT IMPEDE
6874 DISASTER RECOVERY EFFORTS. (a) In this section, "work group" means
6975 the work group established under this section.
7076 (b) The work group is established and composed of
7177 representatives of the division, any other state agencies selected
7278 by the division, and local governmental entities.
7379 (c) The chief of the division serves as chair of the work
7480 group.
7581 (d) The work group shall conduct a study on local
7682 restrictions that impede disaster recovery efforts, including
7783 efforts to remove debris and erect short-term housing.
7884 (e) The study conducted under Subsection (d) must include:
7985 (1) an overview of official actions by governing
8086 bodies of political subdivisions and requirements imposed by deed
8187 restrictions or property owners' associations that impede state and
8288 federal disaster recovery efforts in this state; and
8389 (2) recommendations for minimizing the effect of the
8490 official actions and requirements described by Subdivision (1) on
8591 state and federal disaster recovery efforts in this state.
8692 (f) Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall
8793 submit a written report to the members of the legislature with the
8894 results of the study required under this section.
8995 (g) This section expires and the work group is abolished
9096 January 1, 2021.
9197 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
9298 Division of Emergency Management shall develop the catastrophic
9399 debris management plan and model guide required by Section 418.054,
94100 Government Code, as added by this Act.
95101 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
96- ______________________________ ______________________________
97- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
98- I certify that H.B. No. 5 was passed by the House on April 11,
99- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
100- voting.
101- ______________________________
102- Chief Clerk of the House
103- I certify that H.B. No. 5 was passed by the Senate on May 22,
104- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
105- ______________________________
106- Secretary of the Senate
107- APPROVED: _____________________
108- Date
109- _____________________
110- Governor
102+ * * * * *