Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB510 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Wilson, Bucy (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 510
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the power of certain counties to enact park use rules.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 320.0455(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies to:
 (1)  a county with a population of 2.8 million or more;
 and
 (2)  a county with a population of more than 410,000 and
 less than 455,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *