Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB510 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            H.B. No. 510


 AN ACT
 relating to the power of certain counties to enact park use rules.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 320.0455(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies to:
 (1)  a county with a population of 2.8 million or more;
 and
 (2)  a county with a population of more than 410,000 and
 less than 455,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 510 was passed by the House on April
 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 128, Nays 11, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 510 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 510 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 2, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 510 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 510 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor