1 | | - | H.B. No. 510 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Wilson, Bucy (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 510 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & |
---|
| 4 | + | Rural Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the power of certain counties to enact park use rules. |
---|
6 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 320.0455(a), Local Government Code, is |
---|
8 | 14 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 15 | | (a) This section applies to: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (1) a county with a population of 2.8 million or more; |
---|
11 | 17 | | and |
---|
12 | 18 | | (2) a county with a population of more than 410,000 and |
---|
13 | 19 | | less than 455,000. |
---|
14 | 20 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
15 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
16 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
17 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 510 was passed by the House on April |
---|
18 | | - | 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 11, 2 present, not |
---|
19 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
20 | | - | H.B. No. 510 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
21 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
22 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
23 | | - | on H.B. No. 510 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, |
---|
24 | | - | Nays 2, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
25 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
26 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
27 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 510 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
28 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
29 | | - | 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
30 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
31 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
32 | | - | 510 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
35 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Date |
---|
37 | | - | __________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 21 | + | * * * * * |
---|