Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019