1 | | - | H.B. No. 531 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Miller (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 531 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the retention by hospitals and physicians of certain |
---|
6 | 12 | | medical records of a sexual assault victim. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 241, Health and Safety |
---|
9 | 15 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 241.1031 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 241.1031. PRESERVATION OF RECORD FROM FORENSIC MEDICAL |
---|
11 | 17 | | EXAMINATION. (a) A hospital may not destroy a medical record from |
---|
12 | 18 | | the forensic medical examination of a sexual assault victim |
---|
13 | 19 | | conducted under Article 56.06 or 56.065, Code of Criminal |
---|
14 | 20 | | Procedure, until the 20th anniversary of the date the record was |
---|
15 | 21 | | created. |
---|
16 | 22 | | (b) A hospital may maintain a medical record described by |
---|
17 | 23 | | Subsection (a) in the same form in which the hospital maintains |
---|
18 | 24 | | other medical records. |
---|
19 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Section 153.003, Occupations Code, is amended to |
---|
20 | 26 | | read as follows: |
---|
21 | 27 | | Sec. 153.003. RULES REGARDING MAINTENANCE OF PATIENT |
---|
22 | 28 | | RECORDS. (a) The board by rule shall establish the period for |
---|
23 | 29 | | which patient records must be maintained. |
---|
24 | 30 | | (b) The rules adopted under this section must prohibit a |
---|
25 | 31 | | physician from destroying a medical record from the forensic |
---|
26 | 32 | | medical examination of a sexual assault victim conducted under |
---|
27 | 33 | | Article 56.06 or 56.065, Code of Criminal Procedure, until the 20th |
---|
28 | 34 | | anniversary of the date the record was created. |
---|
29 | 35 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
30 | 36 | | a medical record created on or after March 1, 2020. A medical |
---|
31 | 37 | | record created before March 1, 2020, is governed by the law in |
---|
32 | 38 | | effect on the date the record was created, and the former law is |
---|
33 | 39 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
34 | 40 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
37 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 531 was passed by the House on April |
---|
38 | | - | 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
39 | | - | voting. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 531 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
43 | | - | 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
46 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Date |
---|
48 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 41 | + | * * * * * |
---|