Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB637 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2019

                            By: González of El Paso, VanDeaver H.B. No. 637
 (Senate Sponsor - Watson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 25, 2019;
 March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2;
 May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 637 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the salaries of the superintendent of the Texas School
 for the Blind and Visually Impaired and the superintendent of the
 Texas School for the Deaf.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30.023(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The board shall annually establish the superintendent's
 salary. [The annual salary may not exceed 120 percent of the annual
 salary of the highest paid instructional administrator at the
 school.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 30.053(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The board shall annually establish the superintendent's
 salary. [The annual salary may not exceed 120 percent of the annual
 salary of the highest paid instructional administrator at the
 school.]
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies to an initial employment
 contract that is entered into between the superintendent and the
 governing board of the Texas School for the Blind and Visually
 Impaired or the governing board of the Texas School for the Deaf, as
 appropriate, on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 employment contract that is initially entered into before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed at
 the time the contract was entered into, and the former law remains
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *