Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB638 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill March 12, 2019