Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB663 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: King of Hemphill (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 663
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
3- April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 1;
6- May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 663 By: Taylor
1+86R17322 CAE-D
2+ By: King of Hemphill H.B. No. 663
93
104
115 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
126 AN ACT
13- relating to proclamations for the production of instructional
14- materials and selection of instructional materials by public
15- schools.
7+ relating to a continuing review and revision of the essential
8+ knowledge and skills of the public school foundation curriculum and
9+ proclamations for the production of instructional materials.
1610 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
17- SECTION 1. Section 31.002, Education Code, is amended by
11+ SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
12+ amended by adding Section 28.0025 to read as follows:
13+ Sec. 28.0025. REVIEW AND REVISION OF ESSENTIAL KNOWLEDGE
14+ AND SKILLS. (a) The State Board of Education shall:
15+ (1) conduct a review of the essential knowledge and
16+ skills for the foundation curriculum adopted under Section
17+ 28.002(a)(1); and
18+ (2) as necessary, revise the essential knowledge and
19+ skills for that curriculum to narrow the number and scope of student
20+ expectations for each subject and grade level in accordance with
21+ this section.
22+ (b) The scope of the essential knowledge and skills for each
23+ subject and grade level of the foundation curriculum must:
24+ (1) be more narrow than the scope of the essential
25+ knowledge and skills adopted as of January 1, 2019; and
26+ (2) require less time for a demonstration of mastery
27+ than required for the essential knowledge and skills adopted as of
28+ January 1, 2019.
29+ (c) In complying with this section, the State Board of
30+ Education shall:
31+ (1) consider for each subject and grade level, the
32+ time:
33+ (A) a teacher would require to provide
34+ comprehensive instruction on a particular student expectation; and
35+ (B) a typical student would require to master a
36+ particular student expectation;
37+ (2) determine whether, in light of the consideration
38+ required by Subdivision (1), each essential knowledge and skill of
39+ a subject can be comprehensively taught within the instruction time
40+ provided by Section 25.081, not including the amount of time
41+ required for testing;
42+ (3) determine whether the college and career readiness
43+ standards have been appropriately integrated in the essential
44+ knowledge and skills for each subject and grade level; and
45+ (4) consider whether an assessment instrument
46+ administered under Section 39.023 adequately assesses a particular
47+ student expectation.
48+ (c-1) The State Board of Education must ensure that any
49+ revision of the essential knowledge and skills for the foundation
50+ curriculum performed before September 1, 2022, does not result in a
51+ need for the adoption of new instructional materials. This section
52+ expires September 1, 2023.
53+ (d) The State Board of Education shall adopt a schedule for
54+ continuing the review and revision required by this section of the
55+ essential knowledge and skills for each subject and grade level of
56+ the foundation curriculum.
57+ SECTION 2. Section 31.002, Education Code, is amended by
1858 adding Subdivision (1-b) to read as follows:
1959 (1-b) "Proclamation" means a request for production of
2060 instructional materials issued by the State Board of Education.
21- SECTION 2. Section 31.022, Education Code, is amended by
22- adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) and amending Subsection (f) to
23- read as follows:
61+ SECTION 3. Section 31.022, Education Code, is amended by
62+ adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) and amending Subsection
63+ (f) to read as follows:
2464 (b-1) For any state fiscal biennium, the board may only
2565 issue proclamations for instructional materials in which the total
2666 projected cost of instructional materials under the proclamations
2767 does not exceed 75 percent of the total amount used to fund the
2868 instructional materials and technology allotment under Section
2969 31.0211 for that biennium.
30- (b-2) In determining the disbursement of money to the
70+ (b-2) Following the adoption of revised essential knowledge
71+ and skills for any subject, the board shall determine whether
72+ issuance of a proclamation is necessary based on the significance
73+ of the changes to the essential knowledge and skills. If the board
74+ determines a proclamation is necessary, the board shall issue:
75+ (1) a full call for instructional materials aligned to
76+ all of the essential knowledge and skills for the subject and grade
77+ level;
78+ (2) a supplemental call for instructional materials
79+ aligned to new or expanded essential knowledge and skills for the
80+ subject and grade level;
81+ (3) a call for new information demonstrating alignment
82+ of current instructional materials to the revised essential
83+ knowledge and skills; or
84+ (4) any combination of the calls described by
85+ Subdivisions (1), (2), and (3).
86+ (b-3) In determining the disbursement of money to the
3187 available school fund and the amount of that disbursement that will
3288 be used, in accordance with Section 43.001(d), to fund the
3389 instructional materials and technology allotment under Section
3490 31.0211, the board must consider the cost of all instructional
3591 materials and technology requirements for that state fiscal
3692 biennium.
3793 (f) The board shall amend any proclamation [request for
3894 production] issued for the purchase of instructional materials to
3995 conform to the instructional materials funding levels provided by
4096 the General Appropriations Act for the year of implementation and
4197 to comply with Subsection (b-1).
42- SECTION 3. Sections 31.101(d) and (e), Education Code, are
98+ SECTION 4. Sections 31.101(d) and (e), Education Code, are
4399 repealed.
44- SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
45- * * * * *
100+ SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.