Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB663 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/17/2019

                            By: King of Hemphill (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 663
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1;
 May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 663 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to proclamations for the production of instructional
 materials and selection of instructional materials by public
 schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-b) to read as follows:
 (1-b)  "Proclamation" means a request for production of
 instructional materials issued by the State Board of Education.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.022, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) and amending Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (b-1)  For any state fiscal biennium, the board may only
 issue proclamations for instructional materials in which the total
 projected cost of instructional materials under the proclamations
 does not exceed 75 percent of the total amount used to fund the
 instructional materials and technology allotment under Section
 31.0211 for that biennium.
 (b-2)  In determining the disbursement of money to the
 available school fund and the amount of that disbursement that will
 be used, in accordance with Section 43.001(d), to fund the
 instructional materials and technology allotment under Section
 31.0211, the board must consider the cost of all instructional
 materials and technology requirements for that state fiscal
 biennium.
 (f)  The board shall amend any proclamation [request for
 production] issued for the purchase of instructional materials to
 conform to the instructional materials funding levels provided by
 the General Appropriations Act for the year of implementation and
 to comply with Subsection (b-1).
 SECTION 3.  Sections 31.101(d) and (e), Education Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *