By: Clardy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 684 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019; April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 684 By: Hughes A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the care of students with seizure disorders and the training requirements for certain school personnel regarding seizure recognition and related first aid. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as Sam's Law. SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is amended by adding Sections 38.032, 38.033, and 38.034 to read as follows: Sec. 38.032. SEIZURE MANAGEMENT AND TREATMENT PLAN. (a) The parent or guardian of a student with a seizure disorder who seeks care for the student's seizures while the student is at school or participating in a school activity must submit to the school district at which the student is enrolled a copy of a seizure management and treatment plan developed by the student's parent or guardian and the physician responsible for the student's seizure treatment. The plan must be submitted to and reviewed by the district: (1) before or at the beginning of the school year; (2) on enrollment of the student, if the student enrolls in the district after the beginning of the school year; or (3) as soon as practicable following a diagnosis of a seizure disorder for the student. (b) A seizure management and treatment plan must: (1) identify the health care services the student may receive at school or while participating in a school activity; (2) evaluate the student's ability to manage and level of understanding of the student's seizures; and (3) be signed by the student's parent or guardian and the physician responsible for the student's seizure treatment. (c) The care of a student with a seizure disorder by a district employee under a seizure management plan submitted under this section is incident to or within the scope of the duties of the employee's position of employment and involves the exercise of judgment or discretion on the part of the employee for purposes of Section 22.0511. Sec. 38.033. SEIZURE RECOGNITION AND RELATED FIRST AID TRAINING. (a) A school nurse employed by a school district must complete an agency-approved online course of instruction for school nurses regarding managing students with seizure disorders that includes information about seizure recognition and related first aid. (b) A school district employee, other than a school nurse, whose duties at the school include regular contact with students must complete an agency-approved online course of instruction for school personnel regarding awareness of students with seizure disorders that includes information about seizure recognition and related first aid. (c) The agency may approve an online course of instruction provided by a nonprofit national foundation that supports the welfare of individuals with epilepsy and seizure disorders to satisfy the training required under Subsection (a) or (b). (d) The agency shall adopt rules as necessary to administer this section. Sec. 38.034. UNLICENSED SEIZURE CARE ASSISTANT. (a) At each school district campus at which a student with a seizure disorder is enrolled, the principal shall: (1) seek school employees who are not health care professionals to serve as unlicensed seizure care assistants and care for students with seizure disorders; and (2) make efforts to ensure that the campus has: (A) at least one unlicensed seizure care assistant if a full-time nurse is assigned to the campus; and (B) at least three unlicensed seizure care assistants if a full-time nurse is not assigned to the campus. (b) An unlicensed seizure care assistant shall serve under the supervision of the principal. (c) A school employee may not be subject to any penalty or disciplinary action for refusing to serve as an unlicensed seizure care assistant. (d) The care of a student with a seizure disorder by a school employee who is serving as an unlicensed seizure care assistant is incident to or within the scope of the duties of the employee's position of employment and involves the exercise of judgment or discretion on the part of the employee for purposes of Section 22.0511. (e) A school nurse is not responsible for and may not be subject to disciplinary action under Chapter 301, Occupations Code, for actions performed by an unlicensed seizure care assistant. SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2019, the Texas Education Agency shall approve online courses of instruction to satisfy the training requirements of Section 38.033, Education Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020 school year. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *