Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB684 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 684
1+By: Clardy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 684
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
3+ April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
6+ May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 684 By: Hughes
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the care of students with seizure disorders and the
614 training requirements for certain school personnel regarding
715 seizure recognition and related first aid.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as Sam's Law.
1018 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
11- amended by adding Sections 38.032 and 38.033 to read as follows:
19+ amended by adding Sections 38.032, 38.033, and 38.034 to read as
20+ follows:
1221 Sec. 38.032. SEIZURE MANAGEMENT AND TREATMENT PLAN. (a)
13- The parent or guardian of a student with a seizure disorder may seek
14- care for the student's seizures while the student is at school or
15- participating in a school activity by submitting to the school
22+ The parent or guardian of a student with a seizure disorder who
23+ seeks care for the student's seizures while the student is at school
24+ or participating in a school activity must submit to the school
1625 district at which the student is enrolled a copy of a seizure
1726 management and treatment plan developed by the student's parent or
1827 guardian and the physician responsible for the student's seizure
1928 treatment. The plan must be submitted to and reviewed by the
2029 district:
2130 (1) before or at the beginning of the school year;
2231 (2) on enrollment of the student, if the student
2332 enrolls in the district after the beginning of the school year; or
2433 (3) as soon as practicable following a diagnosis of a
2534 seizure disorder for the student.
2635 (b) A seizure management and treatment plan must:
2736 (1) identify the health care services the student may
2837 receive at school or while participating in a school activity;
2938 (2) evaluate the student's ability to manage and level
3039 of understanding of the student's seizures; and
3140 (3) be signed by the student's parent or guardian and
3241 the physician responsible for the student's seizure treatment.
3342 (c) The care of a student with a seizure disorder by a
3443 district employee under a seizure management plan submitted under
3544 this section is incident to or within the scope of the duties of the
3645 employee's position of employment and involves the exercise of
3746 judgment or discretion on the part of the employee for purposes of
3847 Section 22.0511.
39- (d) The immunity from liability provided by Section 22.0511
40- applies to an action or failure to act by a district employee in
41- administering a medication, assisting with self-administration, or
42- otherwise providing for the care of a student under a seizure
43- management plan submitted for the student under Subsection (a).
4448 Sec. 38.033. SEIZURE RECOGNITION AND RELATED FIRST AID
4549 TRAINING. (a) A school nurse employed by a school district must
4650 complete an agency-approved online course of instruction for school
4751 nurses regarding managing students with seizure disorders that
4852 includes information about seizure recognition and related first
4953 aid.
5054 (b) A school district employee, other than a school nurse,
5155 whose duties at the school include regular contact with students
5256 must complete an agency-approved online course of instruction for
5357 school personnel regarding awareness of students with seizure
5458 disorders that includes information about seizure recognition and
5559 related first aid.
5660 (c) The agency may approve an online course of instruction
5761 provided by a nonprofit national foundation that supports the
5862 welfare of individuals with epilepsy and seizure disorders to
59- satisfy the training required under Subsection (a) or (b). An
60- online course of instruction approved by the agency under this
61- subsection that is provided to a school district must be provided by
62- the nonprofit entity free of charge.
63+ satisfy the training required under Subsection (a) or (b).
6364 (d) The agency shall adopt rules as necessary to administer
6465 this section.
66+ Sec. 38.034. UNLICENSED SEIZURE CARE ASSISTANT. (a) At
67+ each school district campus at which a student with a seizure
68+ disorder is enrolled, the principal shall:
69+ (1) seek school employees who are not health care
70+ professionals to serve as unlicensed seizure care assistants and
71+ care for students with seizure disorders; and
72+ (2) make efforts to ensure that the campus has:
73+ (A) at least one unlicensed seizure care
74+ assistant if a full-time nurse is assigned to the campus; and
75+ (B) at least three unlicensed seizure care
76+ assistants if a full-time nurse is not assigned to the campus.
77+ (b) An unlicensed seizure care assistant shall serve under
78+ the supervision of the principal.
79+ (c) A school employee may not be subject to any penalty or
80+ disciplinary action for refusing to serve as an unlicensed seizure
81+ care assistant.
82+ (d) The care of a student with a seizure disorder by a school
83+ employee who is serving as an unlicensed seizure care assistant is
84+ incident to or within the scope of the duties of the employee's
85+ position of employment and involves the exercise of judgment or
86+ discretion on the part of the employee for purposes of Section
87+ 22.0511.
88+ (e) A school nurse is not responsible for and may not be
89+ subject to disciplinary action under Chapter 301, Occupations Code,
90+ for actions performed by an unlicensed seizure care assistant.
6591 SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2019, the Texas
6692 Education Agency shall approve online courses of instruction to
6793 satisfy the training requirements of Section 38.033, Education
6894 Code, as added by this Act.
6995 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies
7096 beginning with the 2019-2020 school year.
7197 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7298 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7399 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
74100 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
75101 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
76- ______________________________ ______________________________
77- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
78- I certify that H.B. No. 684 was passed by the House on April
79- 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
80- voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
81- H.B. No. 684 on May 22, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
82- conference committee to consider the differences between the two
83- houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
84- on H.B. No. 684 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
85- Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
86- ______________________________
87- Chief Clerk of the House
88- I certify that H.B. No. 684 was passed by the Senate, with
89- amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
90- 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
91- committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
92- that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
93- 684 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
94- ______________________________
95- Secretary of the Senate
96- APPROVED: __________________
97- Date
98- __________________
99- Governor
102+ * * * * *