Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB684 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            H.B. No. 684


 AN ACT
 relating to the care of students with seizure disorders and the
 training requirements for certain school personnel regarding
 seizure recognition and related first aid.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as Sam's Law.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 38.032 and 38.033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.032.  SEIZURE MANAGEMENT AND TREATMENT PLAN. (a)
 The parent or guardian of a student with a seizure disorder may seek
 care for the student's seizures while the student is at school or
 participating in a school activity by submitting to the school
 district at which the student is enrolled a copy of a seizure
 management and treatment plan developed by the student's parent or
 guardian and the physician responsible for the student's seizure
 treatment. The plan must be submitted to and reviewed by the
 district:
 (1)  before or at the beginning of the school year;
 (2)  on enrollment of the student, if the student
 enrolls in the district after the beginning of the school year; or
 (3)  as soon as practicable following a diagnosis of a
 seizure disorder for the student.
 (b)  A seizure management and treatment plan must:
 (1)  identify the health care services the student may
 receive at school or while participating in a school activity;
 (2)  evaluate the student's ability to manage and level
 of understanding of the student's seizures; and
 (3)  be signed by the student's parent or guardian and
 the physician responsible for the student's seizure treatment.
 (c)  The care of a student with a seizure disorder by a
 district employee under a seizure management plan submitted under
 this section is incident to or within the scope of the duties of the
 employee's position of employment and involves the exercise of
 judgment or discretion on the part of the employee for purposes of
 Section 22.0511.
 (d)  The immunity from liability provided by Section 22.0511
 applies to an action or failure to act by a district employee in
 administering a medication, assisting with self-administration, or
 otherwise providing for the care of a student under a seizure
 management plan submitted for the student under Subsection (a).
 Sec. 38.033.  SEIZURE RECOGNITION AND RELATED FIRST AID
 TRAINING. (a)  A school nurse employed by a school district must
 complete an agency-approved online course of instruction for school
 nurses regarding managing students with seizure disorders that
 includes information about seizure recognition and related first
 aid.
 (b)  A school district employee, other than a school nurse,
 whose duties at the school include regular contact with students
 must complete an agency-approved online course of instruction for
 school personnel regarding awareness of students with seizure
 disorders that includes information about seizure recognition and
 related first aid.
 (c)  The agency may approve an online course of instruction
 provided by a nonprofit national foundation that supports the
 welfare of individuals with epilepsy and seizure disorders to
 satisfy the training required under Subsection (a) or (b). An
 online course of instruction approved by the agency under this
 subsection that is provided to a school district must be provided by
 the nonprofit entity free of charge.
 (d)  The agency shall adopt rules as necessary to administer
 this section.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2019, the Texas
 Education Agency shall approve online courses of instruction to
 satisfy the training requirements of Section 38.033, Education
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with the 2019-2020 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 684 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 684 on May 22, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 684 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 684 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 684 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor