Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB700 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 700
1+By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 700
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
3+ April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 9, 2019, reported
5+ favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 2; May 9, 2019, sent
6+ to printer.)
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the use of the skills development fund by certain
6- entities and a study and report regarding the effectiveness of that
7- fund.
12+ entities.
813 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
914 SECTION 1. Section 303.001(a), Labor Code, is amended to
1015 read as follows:
1116 (a) The purpose of this chapter is to remove administrative
1217 barriers that impede the response of public community and technical
1318 colleges, community-based organizations, local workforce
14- development boards, and the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service
15- to industry and workforce training needs and to develop incentives
16- for public community and technical colleges, community-based
17- organizations, local workforce development boards, and the Texas
18- A&M Engineering Extension Service to provide customized assessment
19- and training in a timely and efficient manner.
19+ development boards, public libraries, and the Texas A&M Engineering
20+ Extension Service to industry and workforce training needs and to
21+ develop incentives for public community and technical colleges,
22+ community-based organizations, local workforce development boards,
23+ public libraries, and the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service
24+ to provide customized assessment and training in a timely and
25+ efficient manner.
2026 SECTION 2. Section 303.002(b), Labor Code, is amended to
2127 read as follows:
2228 (b) A public community or technical college or the Texas A&M
2329 Engineering Extension Service may recover customized assessment
2430 and training costs incurred by the institution if:
2531 (1) there is an actual or projected labor shortage in
2632 the occupation in which training is provided that is not being met
2733 by an existing institution or program in the area; and
2834 (2) the wages at the time of job placement for
2935 individuals who successfully complete customized training at the
3036 public community or technical college or the Texas A&M Engineering
3137 Extension Service are equal to the prevailing wage for that
3238 occupation in the local labor market area.
3339 SECTION 3. Sections 303.003(b), (f), (g), and (h), Labor
3440 Code, are amended to read as follows:
3541 (b) The skills development fund may be used by public
3642 community and technical colleges, community-based organizations,
37- local workforce development boards, and the Texas A&M Engineering
38- Extension Service as start-up or emergency funds for the following
39- job-training purposes:
43+ local workforce development boards, public libraries, and the Texas
44+ A&M Engineering Extension Service as start-up or emergency funds
45+ for the following job-training purposes:
4046 (1) developing customized training programs for
4147 businesses and trade unions; and
4248 (2) sponsoring small and medium-sized business
4349 networks and consortiums.
4450 (f) The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service shall focus
4551 the service's training activities under this chapter on programs
4652 that:
4753 (1) are statewide in nature; or
4854 (2) are not available from a local junior college
4955 district, a local technical college, or a consortium of junior
5056 college districts.
5157 (g) This section does not prohibit the Texas A&M Engineering
5258 Extension Service from participating in a consortium of junior
5359 college districts or with a technical college that provides
5460 training under this chapter.
5561 (h) A community-based organization may apply for money to
5662 participate in a training program only in partnership with a
5763 community and technical college or the Texas A&M Engineering
5864 Extension Service. A community-based organization providing
5965 services regulated by the state shall provide evidence of any
6066 certification, license, or registration required by law.
61- SECTION 4. (a) The Texas Workforce Commission shall
62- conduct a study on and develop recommendations for increasing the
63- effectiveness of the skills development fund established under
64- Chapter 303, Labor Code. The recommendations must include
65- strategies for better achieving the fund's purposes, improving
66- outcomes, and expanding participation in the opportunities
67- available through the fund.
68- (b) Not later than December 1, 2020, the Texas Workforce
69- Commission shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
70- the speaker of the house of representatives, and the chairs of the
71- legislative committees with appropriate jurisdiction a report
72- detailing the commission's findings and recommendations under
73- Subsection (a) of this section.
74- SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
75- ______________________________ ______________________________
76- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
77- I certify that H.B. No. 700 was passed by the House on April
78- 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 127, Nays 12, 2 present, not
79- voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
80- H.B. No. 700 on May 17, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
81- conference committee to consider the differences between the two
82- houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
83- on H.B. No. 700 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 111,
84- Nays 28, 2 present, not voting.
85- ______________________________
86- Chief Clerk of the House
87- I certify that H.B. No. 700 was passed by the Senate, with
88- amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays
89- 6; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
90- committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
91- that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
92- 700 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
93- ______________________________
94- Secretary of the Senate
95- APPROVED: __________________
96- Date
97- __________________
98- Governor
67+ SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
68+ * * * * *