Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB700 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            H.B. No. 700


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of the skills development fund by certain
 entities and a study and report regarding the effectiveness of that
 fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 303.001(a), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The purpose of this chapter is to remove administrative
 barriers that impede the response of public community and technical
 colleges, community-based organizations, local workforce
 development boards, and the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service
 to industry and workforce training needs and to develop incentives
 for public community and technical colleges, community-based
 organizations, local workforce development boards, and the Texas
 A&M Engineering Extension Service to provide customized assessment
 and training in a timely and efficient manner.
 SECTION 2.  Section 303.002(b), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A public community or technical college or the Texas A&M
 Engineering Extension Service may recover customized assessment
 and training costs incurred by the institution if:
 (1)  there is an actual or projected labor shortage in
 the occupation in which training is provided that is not being met
 by an existing institution or program in the area; and
 (2)  the wages at the time of job placement for
 individuals who successfully complete customized training at the
 public community or technical college or the Texas A&M Engineering
 Extension Service are equal to the prevailing wage for that
 occupation in the local labor market area.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 303.003(b), (f), (g), and (h), Labor
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The skills development fund may be used by public
 community and technical colleges, community-based organizations,
 local workforce development boards, and the Texas A&M Engineering
 Extension Service as start-up or emergency funds for the following
 job-training purposes:
 (1)  developing customized training programs for
 businesses and trade unions; and
 (2)  sponsoring small and medium-sized business
 networks and consortiums.
 (f)  The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service shall focus
 the service's training activities under this chapter on programs
 that:
 (1)  are statewide in nature; or
 (2)  are not available from a local junior college
 district, a local technical college, or a consortium of junior
 college districts.
 (g)  This section does not prohibit the Texas A&M Engineering
 Extension Service from participating in a consortium of junior
 college districts or with a technical college that provides
 training under this chapter.
 (h)  A community-based organization may apply for money to
 participate in a training program only in partnership with a
 community and technical college or the Texas A&M Engineering
 Extension Service. A community-based organization providing
 services regulated by the state shall provide evidence of any
 certification, license, or registration required by law.
 SECTION 4.  (a) The Texas Workforce Commission shall
 conduct a study on and develop recommendations for increasing the
 effectiveness of the skills development fund established under
 Chapter 303, Labor Code. The recommendations must include
 strategies for better achieving the fund's purposes, improving
 outcomes, and expanding participation in the opportunities
 available through the fund.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the Texas Workforce
 Commission shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the speaker of the house of representatives, and the chairs of the
 legislative committees with appropriate jurisdiction a report
 detailing the commission's findings and recommendations under
 Subsection (a) of this section.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 700 was passed by the House on April
 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 127, Nays 12, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 700 on May 17, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 700 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 111,
 Nays 28, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 700 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays
 6; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 700 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor