Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB714 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 714
1+By: Lucio III, Lopez (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 714
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
3+ May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
4+ Affairs & Border Security; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the
5+ following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to a reemployment program available to certain veterans
612 placed on community supervision for a misdemeanor offense.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
915 amended by adding Subchapter H-1 to read as follows:
1016 SUBCHAPTER H-1. VETERANS REEMPLOYMENT PROGRAM
1117 Art. 42A.381. VETERANS REEMPLOYMENT PROGRAM. In this
1218 subchapter, "veterans reemployment program" means a program that
1319 provides education and training to veterans with the goal that the
1420 veterans obtain workforce skills and become gainfully employed.
1521 Art. 42A.382. ELIGIBILITY. (a) A defendant placed on
1622 community supervision, including deferred adjudication community
1723 supervision, for a misdemeanor offense is eligible to participate
1824 in a veterans reemployment program under this subchapter if the
1925 defendant is a veteran of the United States armed forces, including
2026 a member of the reserves, national guard, or state guard.
2127 (b) The judge granting community supervision to a defendant
2228 described by Subsection (a) shall inform the defendant of the
2329 defendant's eligibility for participation in a veterans
2430 reemployment program but may not require the defendant to
2531 participate in the program.
2632 (c) A judge may impose any condition of community
2733 supervision that the judge is authorized to impose under this
2834 chapter on a defendant who chooses to participate in the program
2935 under this subchapter, except that the judge may not impose a
3036 condition related to the program or the defendant's participation
3137 in the program.
3238 Art. 42A.383. EDUCATION AND TRAINING COURSES. (a) The
3339 program shall provide program participants with access to workforce
3440 development education and training courses developed or approved by
3541 the Texas Workforce Commission under Chapter 316, Labor Code.
3642 (b) The education and training courses under this article
3743 must focus on providing a participant with useful workplace skills
3844 most likely to lead to gainful employment by the participant.
3945 (c) The education and training courses may be
4046 individualized based on any physical or intellectual limitations of
4147 the participant.
4248 Art. 42A.384. COMPLETION OF PROGRAM. A participant
4349 successfully completes the veterans reemployment program if the
4450 participant diligently attends and successfully completes the
4551 education and training courses under Article 42A.383 and:
4652 (1) obtains employment and retains that employment for
4753 a continuous period of three months;
4854 (2) diligently searches for employment for a
4955 continuous period of six months; or
5056 (3) is determined by the court to be unemployable
5157 because of a disability.
5258 Art. 42A.385. EXTENDED PERIOD ALLOWED FOR COMPLETION OF
5359 PROGRAM. A defendant is not required to successfully complete a
5460 program under this subchapter before the defendant completes the
5561 applicable period of community supervision. The defendant may
5662 continue to participate in a program following the defendant's
5763 completion of that period.
5864 Art. 42A.386. FAILURE TO COMPLETE PROGRAM. The judge may
5965 not revoke the community supervision of a defendant solely because
6066 the defendant fails to successfully complete a program under this
6167 subchapter.
6268 SECTION 2. Subchapter E-1, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
6369 amended by adding Section 411.0729 to read as follows:
6470 Sec. 411.0729. PROCEDURE FOR CERTAIN VETERANS PLACED ON
6571 COMMUNITY SUPERVISION. (a) On successful completion of the
6672 veterans reemployment program under Subchapter H-1, Chapter 42A,
6773 Code of Criminal Procedure, and all other conditions of the
6874 defendant's community supervision, including deferred adjudication
6975 community supervision, after notice to the state and a hearing on
7076 whether issuance of an order of nondisclosure is in the best
7177 interest of justice, the court shall enter an order of
7278 nondisclosure with respect to all records of the offense for which
7379 the defendant was placed on community supervision.
7480 (b) Subsection (a) applies regardless of whether the
7581 defendant meets the other eligibility criteria under this
7682 subchapter.
7783 SECTION 3. Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by
7884 adding Chapter 316 to read as follows:
7985 CHAPTER 316. VETERANS REEMPLOYMENT EDUCATION AND TRAINING COURSES
8086 Sec. 316.001. EDUCATION AND TRAINING COURSES. (a) The
8187 commission shall develop or approve education and training courses
8288 for the veterans reemployment program under Subchapter H-1, Chapter
8389 42A, Code of Criminal Procedure, to assist eligible veterans in
8490 obtaining workforce skills and becoming gainfully employed.
8591 (b) The education and training courses must provide
8692 instruction in workforce skills appropriate for veterans with
8793 disabilities.
8894 SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
8995 Workforce Commission shall develop or approve education and
9096 training courses as required under Chapter 316, Labor Code, as
9197 added by this Act.
9298 SECTION 5. Subchapter H-1, Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal
9399 Procedure, as added by this Act, applies only to a person placed on
94100 community supervision, including deferred adjudication community
95101 supervision, on or after January 1, 2020.
96102 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
97103 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
98104 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
99105 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
100106 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
101- ______________________________ ______________________________
102- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
103- I certify that H.B. No. 714 was passed by the House on May 3,
104- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
105- voting.
106- ______________________________
107- Chief Clerk of the House
108- I certify that H.B. No. 714 was passed by the Senate on May
109- 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
110- ______________________________
111- Secretary of the Senate
112- APPROVED: _____________________
113- Date
114- _____________________
115- Governor
107+ * * * * *