Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB722 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019