Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB766 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Huberty, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 766
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exemptions for disabled peace officers and fire
 fighters from payment of tuition and fees at public institutions of
 higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 54.352, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.352.  DISABLED PEACE OFFICERS AND FIRE FIGHTERS [;
 OPTIONAL EXEMPTION].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 54.352(a), (g), and (h), Education
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing board of an institution of higher
 education shall [may] exempt a student from the payment of tuition
 and [required] fees [authorized by this chapter] for a course for
 which space is available if the student:
 (1)  is a resident of this state and has resided in this
 state for the 12 months immediately preceding the beginning of the
 semester or session for which an exemption is sought;
 (2)  is permanently disabled as a result of an injury
 suffered during the performance of a duty as:
 (A)  a peace officer of this state or a political
 subdivision of this state; or
 (B)  a fire fighter, as defined by Section
 614.001, Government Code, employed by this state or a political
 subdivision of this state; and
 (3)  is unable to continue employment as a peace
 officer or fire fighter because of the disability.
 (g)  For the purpose of [In] this section, an injury is
 suffered during the performance of a duty as a peace officer if the
 injury occurs ["injury suffered during the performance of a duty as
 a peace officer" means an injury occurring] as a result of the peace
 officer's performance of any of the following law enforcement
 duties:
 (1)  traffic enforcement or traffic control duties,
 including enforcement of traffic laws, investigation of vehicle
 accidents, or directing traffic;
 (2)  pursuit, arrest, or search of a person reasonably
 believed to have violated a law;
 (3)  investigation, including undercover
 investigation, of a criminal act;
 (4)  patrol duties, including automobile, bicycle,
 foot, air, or horse patrol;
 (5)  duties related to the transfer of prisoners; or
 (6)  training duties, including participation in any
 training required by the officer's employer or supervisor or by the
 Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
 (h)  For the purpose of this section, a person [peace
 officer] is considered permanently disabled only if the chief
 administrative officer of the law enforcement agency, fire
 department, or other entity that employed the person [officer] at
 the time of the injury, as applicable, determines the person
 [officer] is permanently disabled and satisfies any requirement of
 an institution under Subsection (e).
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to an
 exemption from tuition and fees beginning with the 2019 fall
 semester.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *