1 | | - | H.B. No. 766 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Huberty, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 766 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
16 | 21 | | (a) The governing board of an institution of higher |
---|
17 | 22 | | education shall [may] exempt a student from the payment of tuition |
---|
18 | 23 | | and [required] fees [authorized by this chapter] for a course for |
---|
19 | 24 | | which space is available if the student: |
---|
20 | 25 | | (1) is a resident of this state and has resided in this |
---|
21 | 26 | | state for the 12 months immediately preceding the beginning of the |
---|
22 | 27 | | semester or session for which an exemption is sought; |
---|
23 | 28 | | (2) is permanently disabled as a result of an injury |
---|
24 | 29 | | suffered during the performance of a duty as: |
---|
25 | 30 | | (A) a peace officer of this state or a political |
---|
26 | 31 | | subdivision of this state; or |
---|
27 | 32 | | (B) a fire fighter, as defined by Section |
---|
28 | 33 | | 614.001, Government Code, employed by this state or a political |
---|
29 | 34 | | subdivision of this state; and |
---|
30 | 35 | | (3) is unable to continue employment as a peace |
---|
31 | 36 | | officer or fire fighter because of the disability. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (g) For the purpose of [In] this section, an injury is |
---|
38 | 38 | | suffered during the performance of a duty as a peace officer if the |
---|
39 | 39 | | injury occurs ["injury suffered during the performance of a duty as |
---|
40 | 40 | | a peace officer" means an injury occurring] as a result of the peace |
---|
41 | 41 | | officer's performance of any of the following law enforcement |
---|
42 | 42 | | duties: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) traffic enforcement or traffic control duties, |
---|
44 | 44 | | including enforcement of traffic laws, investigation of vehicle |
---|
45 | 45 | | accidents, or directing traffic; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) pursuit, arrest, or search of a person reasonably |
---|
47 | 47 | | believed to have violated a law; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (3) investigation, including undercover |
---|
49 | 49 | | investigation, of a criminal act; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (4) patrol duties, including automobile, bicycle, |
---|
51 | 51 | | foot, air, or horse patrol; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (5) duties related to the transfer of prisoners; or |
---|
53 | 53 | | (6) training duties, including participation in any |
---|
54 | 54 | | training required by the officer's employer or supervisor or by the |
---|
55 | 55 | | Texas Commission on Law Enforcement. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (h) For the purpose of this section, a person [peace |
---|
57 | 57 | | officer] is considered permanently disabled only if the chief |
---|
58 | 58 | | administrative officer of the law enforcement agency, fire |
---|
59 | 59 | | department, or other entity that employed the person [officer] at |
---|
60 | 60 | | the time of the injury, as applicable, determines the person |
---|
61 | 61 | | [officer] is permanently disabled and satisfies any requirement of |
---|
62 | 62 | | an institution under Subsection (e). |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply to an |
---|
64 | 64 | | exemption from tuition and fees beginning with the 2019 fall |
---|
65 | 65 | | semester. |
---|
66 | 66 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
67 | 67 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
68 | 68 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
69 | 69 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
70 | 70 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
71 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
73 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 766 was passed by the House on April |
---|
74 | | - | 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 3, 2 present, not |
---|
75 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
76 | | - | H.B. No. 766 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
77 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
78 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
79 | | - | on H.B. No. 766 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, |
---|
80 | | - | Nays 2, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
81 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
83 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 766 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
84 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
85 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
86 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
87 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
88 | | - | 766 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. |
---|
89 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
91 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
92 | | - | Date |
---|
93 | | - | __________________ |
---|
94 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 71 | + | * * * * * |
---|