Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB766 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            H.B. No. 766


 AN ACT
 relating to exemptions for disabled peace officers and fire
 fighters from payment of tuition and fees at public institutions of
 higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 54.352, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.352.  DISABLED PEACE OFFICERS AND FIRE FIGHTERS [;
 OPTIONAL EXEMPTION].
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.352, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (g), and (h) and adding Subsection (b-1)
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing board of an institution of higher
 education shall [may] exempt a student from the payment of tuition
 and [required] fees [authorized by this chapter] for a course for
 which space is available if the student:
 (1)  is a resident of this state and has resided in this
 state for the 12 months immediately preceding the beginning of the
 semester or session for which an exemption is sought;
 (2)  is permanently disabled as a result of an injury
 suffered during the performance of a duty as:
 (A)  a peace officer of this state or a political
 subdivision of this state; or
 (B)  a fire fighter, as defined by Section
 614.001, Government Code, employed by this state or a political
 subdivision of this state; and
 (3)  is unable to continue employment as a peace
 officer or fire fighter because of the disability.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the governing board
 of an institution of higher education may not provide exemptions
 under this section to students enrolled in a specific course in a
 number that exceeds 20 percent of the maximum student enrollment
 designated by the institution for that course.
 (g)  For the purpose of [In] this section, an injury is
 suffered during the performance of a duty as a peace officer if the
 injury occurs ["injury suffered during the performance of a duty as
 a peace officer" means an injury occurring] as a result of the peace
 officer's performance of any of the following law enforcement
 duties:
 (1)  traffic enforcement or traffic control duties,
 including enforcement of traffic laws, investigation of vehicle
 accidents, or directing traffic;
 (2)  pursuit, arrest, or search of a person reasonably
 believed to have violated a law;
 (3)  investigation, including undercover
 investigation, of a criminal act;
 (4)  patrol duties, including automobile, bicycle,
 foot, air, or horse patrol;
 (5)  duties related to the transfer of prisoners; or
 (6)  training duties, including participation in any
 training required by the officer's employer or supervisor or by the
 Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
 (h)  For the purpose of this section, a person [peace
 officer] is considered permanently disabled only if the chief
 administrative officer of the law enforcement agency, fire
 department, or other entity that employed the person [officer] at
 the time of the injury, as applicable, determines the person
 [officer] is permanently disabled and satisfies any requirement of
 an institution under Subsection (e).
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to an
 exemption from tuition and fees beginning with the 2019 fall
 semester.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 766 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 3, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 766 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 766 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 2, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 766 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 766 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor