Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB826 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019