Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB866 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019