Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB866 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 866
1+By: Anchia, et al. H.B. No. 866
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell, Johnson)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
4+ May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
5+ Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported favorably
6+ by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to
7+ printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the installation, removal, and replacement of certain
614 gas pipelines; clarifying changes to related administrative
715 penalties.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Sections 121.206(a) and (d), Utilities Code, are
1018 amended to read as follows:
1119 (a) The railroad commission may assess an administrative
1220 penalty against a person who violates Section 121.201 or a safety
1321 standard or other rule prescribed or adopted under this subchapter
1422 [that section].
1523 (d) The railroad commission by rule shall adopt guidelines
1624 to be used in determining the amount of a penalty under this
1725 subchapter. The guidelines shall include a penalty calculation
1826 worksheet that specifies the typical penalty for certain
1927 violations, circumstances justifying enhancement of a penalty and
2028 the amount of the enhancement, and circumstances justifying a
2129 reduction in a penalty and the amount of the reduction. The
2230 guidelines shall take into account:
2331 (1) the person's history of previous violations of
2432 Section 121.201 or a safety standard or other rule prescribed or
2533 adopted under this subchapter [that section], including the number
2634 of previous violations;
2735 (2) the seriousness of the violation and of any
2836 pollution resulting from the violation;
2937 (3) any hazard to the health or safety of the public;
3038 (4) the degree of culpability;
3139 (5) the demonstrated good faith of the person charged;
3240 and
3341 (6) any other factor the commission considers
3442 relevant.
3543 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 121, Utilities Code, is
3644 amended by adding Section 121.213 to read as follows:
3745 Sec. 121.213. INSTALLATION, REMOVAL, AND REPLACEMENT OF
3846 CERTAIN PIPELINES. (a) In this section, "distribution gas
3947 pipeline facility" means a pipeline facility that distributes
4048 natural gas directly to end-use customers.
4149 (b) A distribution gas pipeline facility operator may not
4250 install as part of the operator's underground system a cast iron,
4351 wrought iron, or bare steel pipeline.
4452 (c) The railroad commission by rule shall require the
4553 operator of a distribution gas pipeline facility system to:
4654 (1) develop and implement a risk-based program for the
4755 removal or replacement of underground distribution gas pipeline
4856 facilities; and
4957 (2) annually remove or replace at least eight percent
5058 of underground distribution gas pipeline facilities posing the
5159 greatest risk in the system and identified for replacement under
5260 the program.
5361 (d) A distribution gas pipeline facility operator shall
5462 replace any known cast iron pipelines installed as part of the
5563 operator's underground system not later than December 31, 2021.
5664 (e) Subsection (d) and this subsection expire September 1,
5765 2023.
5866 SECTION 3. The Railroad Commission of Texas shall adopt any
5967 rules necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act not
6068 later than December 31, 2019.
6169 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6270 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6371 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6472 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6573 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
66- ______________________________ ______________________________
67- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
68- I certify that H.B. No. 866 was passed by the House on May 3,
69- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 17, 2 present, not
70- voting.
71- ______________________________
72- Chief Clerk of the House
73- I certify that H.B. No. 866 was passed by the Senate on May
74- 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
75- ______________________________
76- Secretary of the Senate
77- APPROVED: _____________________
78- Date
79- _____________________
80- Governor
74+ * * * * *