Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB888 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019