1 | | - | H.B. No. 888 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Landgraf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 888 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 6, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 15, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 888 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting a |
---|
6 | 14 | | child as a family member at a port of entry. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 37, Penal Code, is amended by adding |
---|
9 | 17 | | Section 37.082 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 37.082. MISREPRESENTING CHILD AS FAMILY MEMBER AT PORT |
---|
11 | 19 | | OF ENTRY. (a) In this section: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) "Child" means a person younger than 18 years of |
---|
13 | 21 | | age. |
---|
14 | 22 | | (2) "Family member" means a person who is related to |
---|
15 | 23 | | another person by consanguinity or affinity. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (3) "Port of entry" means a place designated by |
---|
17 | 25 | | executive order of the president of the United States, by order of |
---|
18 | 26 | | the United States secretary of the treasury, or by act of the United |
---|
19 | 27 | | States Congress at which a customs officer is authorized to enforce |
---|
20 | 28 | | customs laws. |
---|
21 | 29 | | (b) A person commits an offense if the person, with intent |
---|
22 | 30 | | to commit an offense under Section 20A.02, knowingly misrepresents |
---|
23 | 31 | | a child as a family member of the person to a peace officer or |
---|
24 | 32 | | federal special investigator at a port of entry. |
---|
25 | 33 | | (c) An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor. |
---|
26 | 34 | | (d) If conduct that constitutes an offense under this |
---|
27 | 35 | | section also constitutes an offense under another law, the actor |
---|
28 | 36 | | may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both. |
---|
29 | 37 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
32 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 888 was passed by the House on May 2, |
---|
33 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 94, Nays 46, 2 present, not |
---|
34 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
35 | | - | No. 888 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 43, |
---|
36 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
39 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 888 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
40 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
41 | | - | 1. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
44 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Date |
---|
46 | | - | __________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 38 | + | * * * * * |
---|