Senate | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Record vote RV#1121 | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Record vote RV#1084 | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Amended 1-Ortega | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 01/17/2019 | Filed |