Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Record vote RV#320
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2019
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2018
|
Filed
|
|
|