Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Record vote RV#514 | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | ||
House | 01/18/2019 | Filed |