Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB961 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019