Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Record vote RV#1049
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn 5-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amendment amended 6-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 5-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amended 3-Metcalf
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amended 2-Metcalf
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amended 1-Metcalf
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2019
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|