1 | | - | By: Metcalf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 974 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019; |
---|
3 | | - | May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Education; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Metcalf, Huberty, Landgraf, H.B. No. 974 |
---|
| 2 | + | González of El Paso, Dutton, et al. |
---|
7 | 3 | | |
---|
8 | 4 | | |
---|
9 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 7 | | relating to public school safety measures and procedures. |
---|
12 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 11.159, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 10 | | adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 11 | | (b-1) The State Board of Education shall require a trustee |
---|
16 | 12 | | to complete training on school safety. The state board, in |
---|
17 | 13 | | coordination with the Texas School Safety Center, shall develop the |
---|
18 | 14 | | curriculum and materials for the training. |
---|
19 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Section 38.022, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
20 | 16 | | amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsections (c-1), |
---|
21 | 17 | | (c-2), and (e) to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 18 | | (a) A school district shall [may] require a person who |
---|
23 | 19 | | enters a district campus for a purpose other than to attend a |
---|
24 | 20 | | school-sponsored event that is open to the public to display the |
---|
25 | 21 | | person's driver's license or another form of identification |
---|
26 | 22 | | containing the person's photograph issued by a governmental entity. |
---|
27 | 23 | | (c) A school district shall [may] verify whether a person |
---|
28 | 24 | | who visits [visitor to] a district campus for a purpose other than |
---|
29 | 25 | | to attend a school-sponsored event that is open to the public is a |
---|
30 | 26 | | sex offender registered with the computerized central database |
---|
31 | 27 | | maintained by the Department of Public Safety as provided by |
---|
32 | 28 | | Article 62.005, Code of Criminal Procedure, or any other database |
---|
33 | 29 | | accessible by the district. |
---|
34 | 30 | | (c-1) A school district may verify whether a person who |
---|
35 | 31 | | visits a district campus to attend a school-sponsored event that is |
---|
36 | 32 | | open to the public is a sex offender registered with the |
---|
37 | 33 | | computerized central database maintained by the Department of |
---|
38 | 34 | | Public Safety as provided by Article 62.005, Code of Criminal |
---|
39 | 35 | | Procedure, or any other database accessible by the district. |
---|
40 | 36 | | (c-2) A school district may: |
---|
41 | 37 | | (1) develop a form of identification containing a |
---|
42 | 38 | | person's photograph that is valid only during the school year for |
---|
43 | 39 | | which it is issued; and |
---|
44 | 40 | | (2) issue that form of identification to a student's |
---|
45 | 41 | | parent or guardian who does not possess any other form of |
---|
46 | 42 | | identification described by Subsection (a). |
---|
47 | 43 | | (e) For purposes of this section, an event is a |
---|
48 | 44 | | school-sponsored event that is open to the public if the event is |
---|
49 | 45 | | held on a district campus and individuals other than district |
---|
50 | 46 | | employees or students are encouraged, invited, or permitted to |
---|
51 | 47 | | attend. |
---|
52 | 48 | | SECTION 3. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020 |
---|
53 | 49 | | school year. |
---|
54 | 50 | | SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2020, the State Board |
---|
55 | 51 | | of Education, in coordination with the Texas School Safety Center, |
---|
56 | 52 | | shall develop the curriculum and materials for the training on |
---|
57 | 53 | | school safety required under Section 11.159(b-1), Education Code, |
---|
58 | 54 | | as added by this Act. |
---|
59 | 55 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
60 | 56 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
61 | 57 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
62 | 58 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
63 | 59 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|