05/24/2019 | Effective immediately | |||
05/24/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/14/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Record vote RV#170 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 01/23/2019 | Filed |