Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR131 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019