04/04/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
03/27/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Filed |