|
06/15/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Record vote RV#1255
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|